TX HB1682 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to collection and use of child safety data for licensed day-care centers.
Title
Relating to collection and use of child safety data for licensed day-care centers.
Sponsors
Rep. John Raney [R] | Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D] | Rep. Travis Clardy [R] | Rep. Terry Meza [D] |
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] | Rep. Rick Miller [R] |
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB708 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Day Care
Electronic Information Systems
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INTERNET
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Electronic Information Systems
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INTERNET
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety