TX HB1717 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a person holding office as a municipal judge in more than one municipality at the same time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a person holding office as a municipal judge in more than one municipality at the same time.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#479 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 See remarks for effective date
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenatePassed
2019-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-17HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17HouseRecord vote RV#479
2019-04-17HousePassed
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-16HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HJR72 (Enabling for) 2019-05-22 - Filed with the Secretary of State

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback