TX HB1748 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to continuing education requirements for surgical technologists.
Title
Relating to continuing education requirements for surgical technologists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1237 (Y: 138 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1237 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2019-04-04 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2019-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1239 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
SURGICAL TECHNOLOGISTS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
SURGICAL TECHNOLOGISTS