TX HB1781 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to the establishment of the Texas Forensic Science Academy as a program of the Texas Engineering Extension Service of The Texas A&M University System.
Title
Relating to the establishment of the Texas Forensic Science Academy as a program of the Texas Engineering Extension Service of The Texas A&M University System.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Driver [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-29 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-03-03 | Read first time | |
2009-02-25 | Filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Judges
Courts--Prosecuting Attorneys
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Defense Counsel
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
ENGINEERING EXTENSION SERVICE, TEXAS
FORENSIC SCIENCE ACADEMY, TEXAS
Law Enforcement
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
Courts--Judges
Courts--Prosecuting Attorneys
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Defense Counsel
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
ENGINEERING EXTENSION SERVICE, TEXAS
FORENSIC SCIENCE ACADEMY, TEXAS
Law Enforcement
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM