TX HB1794 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of the Work Group on Mental Health Access for First Responders.
Title
Relating to the establishment of the Work Group on Mental Health Access for First Responders.
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Bell [R] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] | Rep. John Wray [R] |
Rep. Robert Guerra [D] | Rep. Cindy Burkett [R] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Fire Fighters & Police--Volunteer
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--General
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Fire Fighters & Police--Volunteer
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--General
Mental Health & Substance Abuse