TX HB1824 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sale and taking of sand, gravel, marl, shell, and mudshell, including the use of funds collected from the sale of those materials and the taking of those materials from the San Jacinto River and its tributaries.
Title
Relating to the sale and taking of sand, gravel, marl, shell, and mudshell, including the use of funds collected from the sale of those materials and the taking of those materials from the San Jacinto River and its tributaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1723 (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#320 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#320 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1723 |
2019-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Creighton |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-12 | House | Record vote RV#320 |
2019-04-12 | House | Passed |
2019-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-12 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-01 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Water
HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT
Mines & Mineral Resources
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
Parks & Wildlife--General
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
SAN JACINTO RIVER
SAN JACINTO RIVER AUTHORITY
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Environment--Water
HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT
Mines & Mineral Resources
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
Parks & Wildlife--General
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
SAN JACINTO RIVER
SAN JACINTO RIVER AUTHORITY
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control