TX HB1828 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibiting the sale and purchase of certain aquatic products; creating a criminal offense; increasing a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to prohibiting the sale and purchase of certain aquatic products; creating a criminal offense; increasing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1356 (Y: 121 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#330 (Y: 113 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Read 2nd time RV#316 (Y: 123 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#330 (Y: 113 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Read 2nd time RV#316 (Y: 123 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-14 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-13 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-13 | House | Record vote RV#1356 |
2019-05-13 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-10 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-10 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-10 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-12 | House | Record vote RV#330 |
2019-04-12 | House | Passed |
2019-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | House | Record vote RV#316 |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB899 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Committee report printed and distributed
Subjects
Animals
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--General
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--General
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing