TX HB1844 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing certain optional designations on a person's driver's license, commercial driver's license, or personal identification certificate.
Title
Relating to authorizing certain optional designations on a person's driver's license, commercial driver's license, or personal identification certificate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Elections
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
Military & Veterans
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--Licenses
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Weapons
Elections
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
Military & Veterans
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--Licenses
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Weapons