TX HB1862 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain required disclosures and prohibited practices of certain employee benefit plans and health insurance policies that provide benefits for dental care services.
Title
Relating to certain required disclosures and prohibited practices of certain employee benefit plans and health insurance policies that provide benefits for dental care services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB2486 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
SB1550 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB1550 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1862 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01862I.htm |