TX HB1866 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prescribing of opioids for acute pain.
Title
Relating to the prescribing of opioids for acute pain.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Crimes--Drugs
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF