TX HB1867 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of educator certification and assignment requirements to school districts of innovation.
Title
Relating to the applicability of educator certification and assignment requirements to school districts of innovation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2017-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Educator Quality by chair |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Bilingual
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--Bilingual
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1867 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01867I.htm |