TX HB1868 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
Pending: Senate Water & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
Pending: Senate Water & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Texas Rural Water Advisory Council.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Texas Rural Water Advisory Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#890 (Y: 129 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#890 |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-01 | House | Amended 1-Lozano |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
GENERAL LAND OFFICE COMMISSIONER
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
RURAL WATER ADVISORY COUNCIL, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
WATER
Water--General
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
GENERAL LAND OFFICE COMMISSIONER
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
RURAL WATER ADVISORY COUNCIL, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
WATER
Water--General