TX HB1879 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the automatic enrollment of certain women in Medicaid and the Healthy Texas Women program.
Title
Relating to the automatic enrollment of certain women in Medicaid and the Healthy Texas Women program.
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Davis [R] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] |
Rep. Rick Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Children's Insurance
Health--General
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
Women
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Children's Insurance
Health--General
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
Women