TX HB1888 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to temporary branch polling place hours of operation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to temporary branch polling place hours of operation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1127 (Y: 91 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Point of order withdrawn RV#1091 (Y: 77 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1090 (Y: 81 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1089 (Y: 81 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1088 (Y: 81 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1087 (Y: 80 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenatePassed
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2019-05-21SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Rodríguez
2019-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-10SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#1127
2019-05-08HousePassed
2019-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1091
2019-05-07HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-07HousePoint of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 1, and Rule 8, Section 3
2019-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1090
2019-05-07HouseAmendment tabled 4-C. Turner
2019-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1089
2019-05-07HouseAmendment tabled 3-Zwiener
2019-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1088
2019-05-07HouseAmendment tabled 2-Zwiener
2019-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1087
2019-05-07HouseAmendment tabled 1-Bucy
2019-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-05HouseReferred to Elections
2019-03-05HouseRead first time
2019-02-15HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1888
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01888I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01888E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01888S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01888F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1888&RcdVtNo=1087&Ch=H&Dt=05/07/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1888&RcdVtNo=1088&Ch=H&Dt=05/07/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1888&RcdVtNo=1089&Ch=H&Dt=05/07/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1888&RcdVtNo=1090&Ch=H&Dt=05/07/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1888&RcdVtNo=1091&Ch=H&Dt=05/07/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1888&RcdVtNo=1127&Ch=H&Dt=05/08/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=100

Bill Comments

feedback