TX HB1897 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Returned to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Returned to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to dispute resolution for certain claims arising under insurance policies issued by the Fair Access to Insurance Requirements (FAIR) Plan Association; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to dispute resolution for certain claims arising under insurance policies issued by the Fair Access to Insurance Requirements (FAIR) Plan Association; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1025 (Y: 75 N: 65 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1024 (Y: 75 N: 66 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1024 (Y: 75 N: 66 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Returned to committee |
2019-05-06 | House | Point of order sustained Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) |
2019-05-06 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-06 | House | Postponed 5/6/19 7:45 PM |
2019-05-06 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-06 | House | Postponed 5/6/19 7:15 PM |
2019-05-06 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-06 | House | Postponed 5/6/19 6:45 PM |
2019-05-06 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) |
2019-05-06 | House | Amendment(s) offered 4-C. Turner |
2019-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#1025 |
2019-05-06 | House | Amendment tabled 3-Y. Davis, Rose, Bowers, Sherman, J.D. Johnson, and Cole |
2019-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#1024 |
2019-05-06 | House | Amendment tabled 2-S. Thompson, Wu, Morales, Dutton, Farrar, Thierry, Calanni, Walle, Rosenthal, Allen, More |
2019-05-06 | House | Amended 1-G. Bonnen |
2019-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Property & Casualty
Insurance--Reform
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
TEXAS FAIR PLAN ASSOCIATION
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Property & Casualty
Insurance--Reform
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
TEXAS FAIR PLAN ASSOCIATION