TX HB1924 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to state agency enforcement of laws regulating small businesses.
Title
Relating to state agency enforcement of laws regulating small businesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB783 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions