TX HB1936 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of the death penalty to a capital offense committed by a person with severe mental illness.
Title
Relating to the applicability of the death penalty to a capital offense committed by a person with severe mental illness.
Sponsors
Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] |
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D] | Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] | Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D] | Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1175 (Y: 77 N: 66 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1175 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-08 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-06 | House | Postponed 5/8/19 10:00 AM |
2019-05-06 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-02 | House | Postponed 5/6/19 10:00 AM |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Capital Punishment
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Crimes--Capital Punishment
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Mental Health & Substance Abuse