TX HB1937 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a franchise or insurance tax credit for certain low-income housing developments.
Title
Relating to a franchise or insurance tax credit for certain low-income housing developments.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Goldman [R] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] |
Rep. Sheryl Cole [D] | Sen. John Whitmire [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#594 (Y: 116 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Amended RV#558 (Y: 119 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Amended RV#558 (Y: 119 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#594 |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#558 |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-23 | House | Amended 1-Oliverson |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1590 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Finance
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
Insurance
Insurance--General
Taxation
Taxation--Franchise
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
Insurance
Insurance--General
Taxation
Taxation--Franchise