TX HB1944 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to extension of deadlines for claims and related settlement and dispute resolution under the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association Act.
Title
Relating to extension of deadlines for claims and related settlement and dispute resolution under the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Sen. Kelly Hancock [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#320 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#320 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-10 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-12 | House | Record vote RV#320 |
2019-04-12 | House | Passed |
2019-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-12 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Property & Casualty
WINDSTORM DEVICES & INSURANCE
WINDSTORM INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, TEXAS
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Property & Casualty
WINDSTORM DEVICES & INSURANCE
WINDSTORM INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, TEXAS