TX HB1968 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to coverage for treatment of craniofacial abnormalities under certain health benefit plans.
Title
Relating to coverage for treatment of craniofacial abnormalities under certain health benefit plans.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Anderson [R] | Rep. Julie Johnson [D] | Rep. Sarah Davis [R] | Rep. Hubert Vo [D] |
Rep. Dennis Paul [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1047 (Y: 121 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#1047 |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety