TX HB1982 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operation of the Texas Property and Casualty Insurance Guaranty Association.
Title
Relating to the operation of the Texas Property and Casualty Insurance Guaranty Association.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Paul [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Companion considered in lieu of in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1063 (Same As) 2019-05-31 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Property & Casualty
PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSN., TEXAS
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Property & Casualty
PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSN., TEXAS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1982 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01982I.htm |