TX HB2 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 70-3)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to ad valorem taxation; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to ad valorem taxation; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-04-30 | House | Companion considered in lieu of CSSB 2 |
2019-04-24 | House | Postponed 4/30/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-24 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-15 | House | Postponed 4/24/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-15 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-11 | House | Postponed 4/15/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Emergency Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Calendars Committee rule adopted |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-28 | House | Amendment(s) considered in committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - See remarks for effective date
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTORS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
PROPERTY TAX ADMINISTRATION ADVISORY BOARD
PUBLIC NOTICE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Taxation
Taxation--General
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--Property-State Administration
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
Taxation--School District
TEXAS PROPERTY TAX REFORM AND RELIEF ACT OF 2019
COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTORS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
PROPERTY TAX ADMINISTRATION ADVISORY BOARD
PUBLIC NOTICE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Taxation
Taxation--General
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--Property-State Administration
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
Taxation--School District
TEXAS PROPERTY TAX REFORM AND RELIEF ACT OF 2019