TX HB200 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the power of certain counties to enact park use rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the power of certain counties to enact park use rules.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseCompanion considered in lieu of in committee
2019-04-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-13HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-02-13HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB286 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback