TX HB2000 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-27)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorizing the issuance of revenue bonds to fund capital projects at certain public institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorizing the issuance of revenue bonds to fund capital projects at certain public institutions of higher education.

Sponsors

Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. John Zerwas [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]
Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]Rep. Michelle Beckley [D]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]
Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]
Rep. Gina Calanni [D]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]
Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. Tom Craddick [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]
Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Harold Dutton [D]Rep. John Frullo [R]
Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]
Rep. Roland Gutierrez [D]Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]
Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Eric Johnson [D]
Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]Rep. Julie Johnson [D]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Ken King [R]
Rep. Tracy King [D]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]
Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Christina Morales [D]
Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D]
Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Mary Perez [D]
Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]
Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. John Turner [D]
Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]

Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#494 (Y: 132 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 2nd time RV#438 (Y: 131 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Higher Education
2019-04-24SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-17HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17HouseRecord vote RV#494
2019-04-17HousePassed
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#438
2019-04-16HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-03HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-05HouseReferred to Higher Education
2019-03-05HouseRead first time
2019-02-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2247 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback