TX HB2001 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to leave for state employees who are volunteers of certain disaster relief organizations.
Title
Relating to leave for state employees who are volunteers of certain disaster relief organizations.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#962 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |