TX HB2009 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of certain direct sales of food to consumers and a limitation on the fee amount for certain permits.
Title
Relating to the regulation of certain direct sales of food to consumers and a limitation on the fee amount for certain permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB932 (Similar To) 2019-05-31 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Agriculture
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
FOOD
Health
Health--General
PERMITS
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
FOOD
Health
Health--General
PERMITS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2009 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02009I.htm |