TX HB2019 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to parental notice provided by school districts regarding the Internet website containing the sex offender database.
Title
Relating to parental notice provided by school districts regarding the Internet website containing the sex offender database.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SEXUAL OFFENDERS
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SEXUAL OFFENDERS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2019 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02019I.htm |