TX HB2023 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of money in the state water pollution control revolving fund.
Title
Relating to the use of money in the state water pollution control revolving fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB942 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Water
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
Environment--Water
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2023 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02023I.htm |