TX HB2050 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to consent requirements for the prescription of certain psychoactive medications to residents of nursing facilities and related institutions.
Title
Relating to consent requirements for the prescription of certain psychoactive medications to residents of nursing facilities and related institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1736 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#880 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#880 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1736 |
2019-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#880 |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-01 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | House | Amended 1-Paddie |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Aging
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Nursing Homes
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Nursing Homes