TX HB2057 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to supportive palliative care.
Title
Relating to supportive palliative care.
Sponsors
Rep. John Zerwas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB916 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
PALLIATIVE CARE INTERDISCIPLINARY ADVISORY COUNCIL
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
PALLIATIVE CARE INTERDISCIPLINARY ADVISORY COUNCIL