TX HB2062 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to reimbursement for home telemonitoring services under Medicaid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to reimbursement for home telemonitoring services under Medicaid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1216 (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-05-13SenateRead first time
2019-05-09SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-09HouseRecord vote RV#1216
2019-05-09HousePassed
2019-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback