TX HB2083 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Left pending in committee
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to determination of state contributions for participation by certain junior college employees in the state employees group benefits program.
Title
Relating to determination of state contributions for participation by certain junior college employees in the state employees group benefits program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-11 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-11 | Co-sponsor authorized | |
2009-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-05 | Referred to Finance | |
2009-05-05 | Read first time | |
2009-05-04 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-02 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Passed | |
2009-05-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-01 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-01 | Amended | |
2009-05-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-06 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-02 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB41 (Same As) 2009-05-04 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Education
Education--Junior College Districts
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Public Employees
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
Education--Junior College Districts
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Public Employees
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations