TX HB2083 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-23 - Effective on 1/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-23 - Effective on 1/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the determination of the appraised value of property for purposes of an ad valorem tax protest or appeal.
Title
Relating to the determination of the appraised value of property for purposes of an ad valorem tax protest or appeal.
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Rep. John Otto [R] | Rep. Byron Cook [R] | Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R] |
Rep. Celia Israel [D] | Sen. Kelly Hancock [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - House - HB 2083Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 2 by Schofield (Y: 93 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 2 by Schofield (Y: 93 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-23 | Effective on 1/1/16 | |
2015-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-14 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-13 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-28 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed |
2015-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-27 | House | Amended |
2015-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-27 | House | Amendment to amendment tabled |
2015-04-27 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-13 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2015-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection