TX HB2092 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to self-directed and semi-independent status of certain health care regulatory agencies; making an appropriation.
Title
Relating to self-directed and semi-independent status of certain health care regulatory agencies; making an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-09 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-09 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-06 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-06 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-06 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Public Health | |
2011-03-08 | Read first time | |
2011-03-02 | Filed |
Subjects
NURSING, TEXAS BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control