TX HB2092 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the road powers of the Fort Bend County Municipal Utility District No. 182.
Title
Relating to the road powers of the Fort Bend County Municipal Utility District No. 182.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - HB 2092Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-05-22 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2015-05-13 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2015-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-11 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-08 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-21 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2015-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-03 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2015-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
FORT BEND COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 182
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility