TX HB2105 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the territory and board of directors of the Bell County Water Control and Improvement District No. 1.
Title
Relating to the territory and board of directors of the Bell County Water Control and Improvement District No. 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#514 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#514 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-10 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-18 | House | Record vote RV#514 |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed |
2019-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-09 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-23 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-21 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2455 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Subjects
BELL COUNTY WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.