TX HB2112 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to salvage motor vehicles, including flood vehicles, and nonrepairable motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to salvage motor vehicles, including flood vehicles, and nonrepairable motor vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1862 (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1862
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-16SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-16SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-08SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-05-08SenateRead first time
2019-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#962
2019-05-03HousePassed
2019-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-03HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-24HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-17HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback