TX HB2114 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health benefit plan coverage of preexisting conditions.
Title
Relating to health benefit plan coverage of preexisting conditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1645 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Insurance
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2114 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02114I.htm |