TX HB2146 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the carrying or possession of a handgun by and the issuance of handgun licenses to certain governmental officials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the carrying or possession of a handgun by and the issuance of handgun licenses to certain governmental officials.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB403 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback