TX HB2151 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of extrapolation by a health maintenance organization or an insurer to audit claims.
Title
Relating to the use of extrapolation by a health maintenance organization or an insurer to audit claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1209 (Y: 92 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1209 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-08 | House | Amended 1-Stucky |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1508 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
AUDITS & AUDITORS
Health Care Providers
HEALTH MAINTENANCE ORGANIZATIONS
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Health Care Providers
HEALTH MAINTENANCE ORGANIZATIONS
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Insurers & Agents