TX HB217 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to health benefit plan coverage for hair prostheses for cancer patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health benefit plan coverage for hair prostheses for cancer patients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1258 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-05-15SenateRead first time
2019-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-10HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-10HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1258
2019-05-10HousePassed
2019-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-10HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-10HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-02HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-30HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-30HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback