TX HB2191 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the public information law.
Title
Relating to the public information law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB944 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Open Records
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
State Employees
State Officers
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Open Records
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
State Employees
State Officers