TX HB2207 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to reimbursement of federal military treatment facilities under the workers' compensation system.
Title
Relating to reimbursement of federal military treatment facilities under the workers' compensation system.
Sponsors
Rep. Hugh Shine [R] | Rep. Philip Cortez [D] | Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D] |
Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB935 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/19