TX HB2209 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an affirmative defense to an allegation of truant conduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an affirmative defense to an allegation of truant conduct.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1258 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-05-14SenateRead first time
2019-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-10HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1258
2019-05-10HousePassed
2019-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-10HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-10HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-03HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-02HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-21HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback