TX HB2235 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the amount credited in a state fiscal year to the judicial fund to provide basic civil legal services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the amount credited in a state fiscal year to the judicial fund to provide basic civil legal services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#533 (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24 Effective immediately
2019-05-24 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-10HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-10HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenatePassed
2019-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-10SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-03SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-03SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Administration
2019-04-24SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-18HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-18HouseRecord vote RV#533
2019-04-18HousePassed
2019-04-18HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-17HousePoint of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(5)
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-08HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Appropriations
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1674 (Same As) 2019-04-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback