TX HB2242 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the classification of workers for purposes of the Texas Unemployment Compensation Act; providing an administrative penalty.
Title
Relating to the classification of workers for purposes of the Texas Unemployment Compensation Act; providing an administrative penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Hubert Vo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB2391 (Same As) 2019-03-06 - Referred to Business & Industry
SB1868 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
SB1868 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2242 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02242I.htm |