TX HB2247 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the execution of a record making an anatomical gift.
Title
Relating to the execution of a record making an anatomical gift.
Sponsors
Rep. John Wray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB258 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
GIFTS & DONATIONS
Health
Health--General
Notaries
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
ORGAN & TISSUE DONATIONS
Health
Health--General
Notaries
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
ORGAN & TISSUE DONATIONS