TX HB2265 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the duties of the Title IV-D agency regarding the collection, modification, and enforcement of child support.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the duties of the Title IV-D agency regarding the collection, modification, and enforcement of child support.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1675 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback