TX HB2282 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of certain limitations on the capture and use of biometric identifiers to financial institutions.
Title
Relating to the applicability of certain limitations on the capture and use of biometric identifiers to financial institutions.
Sponsors
Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#815 (Y: 132 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#815 |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BIOMETRIC IDENTIFIERS & VOICEPRINTS
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Protection of Personal Information
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Protection of Personal Information