TX HB2299 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an exemption from licensing requirements for physicians associated with certain sports teams.
Title
Relating to an exemption from licensing requirements for physicians associated with certain sports teams.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#514 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#514 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-02 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-02 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-18 | House | Record vote RV#514 |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed |
2019-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-03 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS